Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Arthur Cardinal Hinsley

Deceased

Archbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna

Note/Previous Titular See: (Rector/English College)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1865Born
23 Dec 189328.3Ordained PriestPriest of Leeds, England, Great Britain
1905²39.3IncardinatedPriest of Southwark, England, Great Britain
10 Aug 192660.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
30 Nov 192661.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
9 Jan 193064.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sardes
9 Jan 193064.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to Africa for the Missions
25 Mar 193468.5ResignedApostolic Delegate to Africa for the Missions
1 Apr 193569.6AppointedArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
29 Apr 193569.6InstalledArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
13 Dec 193772.3Elevated to Cardinal
13 Dec 193772.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
17 Mar 194377.5DiedArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Arthur Hinsley (VIAF: 2479742)
Arthur Cardinal Hinsley (born , died ) Archbishop of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarlton, Selby, North Yorkshire, Diocese of Beverley, England
Ordained PriestVenerable English, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopVenerable English, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceHare Street House, Buntingford, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Joseph Chapel, Most Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
  • a cardinal for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1926, Number 83
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 121, and Page 122
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 275, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 352, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 421, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 530, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 860, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,073, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 30 Apr 2020

Quantcast