Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Charles Evans

Deceased

Bishop of East Anglia, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1951Born
22 Jun 197523.8Ordained PriestPriest of Southwark, England, Great Britain
14 Feb 200351.5AppointedBishop of East Anglia, England, Great Britain
19 Mar 200351.6Ordained BishopBishop of East Anglia, England, Great Britain
11 Jul 201159.9DiedBishop of East Anglia, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Michael Charles Evans
Bishop Michael Charles Evans (born , died ) Bishop of East Anglia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 12 Jul 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,352

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jul 2017