Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Gordon MacWilliam, M. Afr.

Bishop of Laghouat, Algeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1948 Born
Dec 1991³43.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
Dec 1991³43.0ProfessedMember of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
4 Jul 199243.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
16 Mar 201768.3AppointedBishop of Laghouat, Algeria
20 May 201768.5Ordained BishopBishop of Laghouat, Algeria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Gordon MacWilliam
Bishop John Gordon MacWilliam M. Afr. (born ) Bishop of Laghouat

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWimbledon, Archdiocese of Southwark, England, Great Britain
Ordained PriestWorth, Abbey, Turners Hill, Diocese of Arundel and Brighton, England, Great Britain
Ordained BishopWorth, Abbey, Turners Hill, Diocese of Arundel and Brighton, England, Great Britain

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Laghouat.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2017
  • ob: CB, 14 Apr 2017
  • c2+: CL, 1 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 May 2017