Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Langton Douglas Fox

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1917Born
30 May 194225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Southwark, England, Great Britain
18 Oct 196548.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
18 Oct 196548.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Maura
16 Dec 196548.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maura
16 Jun 197255.3AppointedBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
5 Feb 198163.9ResignedBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
26 Jul 199780.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Langton Douglas Fox
Bishop Langton Douglas Fox (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Menevia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGolders Green, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained PriestSt. John, Seminary, Wonersh, Guildford, Surrey, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Sorrows, Cathedral, Wrexham, Wrexham, Diocese of Menevia, Wales
Death PlaceNazareth House, Wrexham, Wrexham, Diocese of Wrexham, Wales
Buried Place (Original)Wrexham, Cemetery, Ruabon Road, Wrexham, Wrexham, Diocese of Wrexham, Wales

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 94
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 8 Apr 2018