Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Grant

Deceased

Bishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1816Born
21 Nov 184124.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of London District, England, Great Britain
28 Nov 184125.0Ordained PriestPriest of London District, England, Great Britain
27 Jun 185134.5AppointedBishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
6 Jul 185134.6Ordained BishopBishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
31 May 187053.5DiedBishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Grant (VIAF: 63701416)
Bishop Thomas Grant (born , died ) Bishop of Southwark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLigny-lès-Aire, Pas de Calais, Diocese of Arras, France
Ordained PriestVenerable English, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopVenerable English, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Virgo Fidelis, Church, Norwood, London, Diocese of Southwark, England

  • a priest for 28.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 525
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 106
  • od/c01: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 33
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast