Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Phillip Richard Moth

Bishop of Arundel and Brighton, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1958 BornChingola, Zambia
3 Jul 198223.9Ordained PriestPriest of Southwark, England, Great Britain
25 Jul 200951.0AppointedBishop of Great Britain, Military
29 Sep 200951.2Ordained BishopBishop of Great Britain, Military
21 Mar 201556.7AppointedBishop of Arundel and Brighton, England, Great Britain
28 May 201556.8InstalledBishop of Arundel and Brighton, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Charles Phillip Richard Moth:
Bishop Charles Phillip Richard Moth (born ) Bishop of Arundel and Brighton

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Arundel and Brighton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,284
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2015
  • i: CB, 21 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 21 Mar 2015