Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Collins

Deceased

Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1857BornNewbury, Berkshire
30 May 188528.1Ordained PriestPriest of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
31 Mar 190547.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
31 Mar 190547.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Selinus
29 Jun 190548.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selinus
21 Jun 190952.2AppointedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
9 Feb 192466.8DiedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Collins:
Bishop Richard Collins (born , died ) Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 34
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015