Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mark O’Toole

Bishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1963 Born
9 Jun 199026.9Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
9 Nov 201350.3AppointedBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
28 Jan 201450.5Ordained BishopBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Mark O’Toole
Bishop Mark O’Toole (born ) Bishop of Plymouth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLambeth, London, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained PriestSt. Ignatius, Church, Stamford Hill, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained BishopSts. Mary and Boniface, Cathedral, Plymouth, Devon, Diocese of Plymouth, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Plymouth.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Nov 2013
  • ob: CB, 9 Nov 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,084
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • loc: CL, 7 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast