Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alan Charles Clark

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of East Anglia, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1919Born
11 Feb 194525.5Ordained PriestPriest of Southwark, England, Great Britain
31 Mar 196949.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
31 Mar 196949.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Elmhama
13 May 196949.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elmhama
26 Apr 197656.7AppointedBishop of East Anglia, England, Great Britain
21 Mar 199575.6RetiredBishop of East Anglia, England, Great Britain
16 Jul 200282.9DiedBishop Emeritus of East Anglia, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Alan Charles Clark (VIAF: 23715117)
Bishop Alan Charles Clark (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of East Anglia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBickley, Bromley, Kent, Archdiocese of Southwark, England
Ordained PriestSt. Joseph, Church, Bromley, Kent, Archdiocese of Southwark, England
Ordained BishopOur Lady and St Thomas of Canterbury, Cathedral, Northampton, Northamptonshire, Diocese of Northampton, England
Death PlaceNorwich and Norfolk, Hospital, Norwich, Norfolk, Diocese of East Anglia, England
Buried Place (Original)Our Lady of Walsingham, Basilica, Houghton St Giles, Walsingham, Norfolk, Diocese of East Anglia, England

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast