Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Francis Brown

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Pella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1862Born
20 Mar 188623.8Ordained PriestPriest of Southwark, England, Great Britain
29 Jan 192461.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
29 Jan 192461.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Pella
12 Mar 192461.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pella
16 Dec 195189.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Francis Brown (VIAF: 155011845)
Bishop William Francis Brown (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Southwark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDundee, Tayside, Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern District, Scotland
Ordained PriestSt.George, Cathedral, Southwark, London, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained BishopSt.George, Cathedral, Southwark, London, Diocese of Southwark, England
Death PlaceSt. Anne, Church, Vauxhall, London, Diocese of Southwark, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Anne, Church, Vauxhall, London, Diocese of Southwark, England

  • a priest for 65.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 12
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 48
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast