Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Hendricks

Auxiliary Bishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Rossmarkaeum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1956 Born
29 Jul 198428.3Ordained PriestPriest of Southwark, England, Great Britain
28 Dec 200549.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
28 Dec 200549.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Rossmarkaeum
14 Feb 200649.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rossmarkaeum

MicroData Summary for Paul Hendricks
Bishop Paul Hendricks (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Southwark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeckenham, Kent, Archdiocese of Southwark, England
Ordained PriestHoly Innocents, Church, Orpington, Kent, Archdiocese of Southwark, England
Ordained BishopSt. George, Cathedral, Southwark, London, Archdiocese of Southwark, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Southwark.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2005
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,063
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 6 Feb 2018