Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Kevin Lynch, SS.CC.

Auxiliary Bishop of Southwark, England

Titular Bishop of Castrum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1947 BornCork City, Ireland
23 Aug 196518.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
21 Jul 197225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
28 Dec 200558.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
28 Dec 200558.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Castrum
14 Feb 200658.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castrum

MicroData Summary for Patrick Kevin Lynch:
Bishop Patrick Kevin Lynch SS.CC. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Southwark

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Southwark.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2005
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,062

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013