Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
25 Apr 1955 | Born | ||
27 Jun 1981 | 26.1 | Ordained Deacon | Deacon of Leeds, England, Great Britain |
26 Jun 1982 | 27.1 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Leeds, England, Great Britain |
28 Nov 2022 | 67.5 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain |
28 Nov 2022 | 67.5 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Glastonia |
21 Feb 2023 | 67.8 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Glastonia |
(WikiData: Q115483814)
Bishop
Philip Robert
Moger
(born )
Auxiliary Bishop
of Southwark
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Halifax, West Riding of Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England |
Ordained Deacon | St Cuthberts College, Chapel, Ushaw, Durham, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England |
Ordained Priest | St. Mary, Church, Halifax, West Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England |
Ordained Bishop | St. George, Cathedral, Southwark, London, Archdiocese of Southwark, England |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠