Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas McMahon

Bishop Emeritus of Brentwood, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1936 Born
29 Nov 195923.4Ordained PriestPriest of Brentwood, England, Great Britain
16 Jun 198043.9AppointedBishop of Brentwood, England, Great Britain
17 Jul 198044.0Ordained BishopBishop of Brentwood, England, Great Britain
14 Apr 201477.8RetiredBishop of Brentwood, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas McMahon
Bishop Thomas McMahon (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Brentwood

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDorking, Surrey, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained PriestSt. John, College, Wonersh, Guildford, Surrey, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained BishopSacred Heart and St. Helen, Cathedral, Brentwood, Essex, Diocese of Brentwood, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Brentwood.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Apr 2014
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • op.loc: CL, 5 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast