Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Emmanuel Amigo

Deceased

Bishop of Southwark, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1864BornGibraltar
25 Feb 188823.7Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
12 Mar 190439.8AppointedBishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
25 Mar 190439.8Ordained BishopBishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
18 Dec 193773.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Southwark, England, Great Britain
1 Oct 194985.3DiedBishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Peter Emmanuel Amigo:
Archbishop Peter Emmanuel Amigo (born , died ) Bishop of Southwark

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 45.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 30 Sep 2014