Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicholas Gilbert Erskine Hudson

Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England

Titular Bishop of Sanctus Germanus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1959 BornHammersmith
19 Jul 198627.4Ordained PriestPriest of Southwark, England, Great Britain
31 Mar 201455.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
31 Mar 201455.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sanctus Germanus
4 Jun 201455.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sanctus Germanus

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Gilbert Erskine Hudson:
Bishop Nicholas Gilbert Erskine Hudson (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Westminster.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2014
  • ob: Website of the Diocese, 31 Mar 2014
  • c2+: CB, 4 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Jun 2014