Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Joseph Walmsley

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Great Britain, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1926Born
30 May 195326.5Ordained PriestPriest of Southwark, England, Great Britain
8 Jan 197952.1AppointedBishop of Great Britain, Military
8 Jan 197952.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamalluma
22 Feb 197952.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamalluma
7 Mar 199871.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Tamalluma
24 May 200275.5RetiredBishop of Great Britain, Military
26 Dec 201791.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Great Britain, Military

MicroData Summary for Francis Joseph Walmsley
Bishop Francis Joseph Walmsley (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Great Britain, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWoolwich, London, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained PriestSt. John, Seminary, Wonersh, Guildford, Surrey, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained BishopSts. Michael and George, Cathedral, Aldershot, Hampshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England
Death PlaceSt. John, Convent, Kiln Green, Reading, Berkshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Michael, Abbey, Farnborough, Hampshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England

  • a priest for 64.5 years
  • a bishop for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 27 Dec 2017
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast