Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Butt

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Southwark, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Thracia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1826Born
15 Jul 184923.2Ordained PriestPriest of London District, England, Great Britain
19 Dec 188458.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
19 Dec 188458.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Milo
29 Jan 188558.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milo
26 Jun 188559.1AppointedBishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
29 Mar 189770.9ResignedBishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
9 Apr 189770.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Thracia
1 Nov 189973.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Southwark, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Butt
Bishop John Baptist Butt (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Southwark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRichmond-on-Thames, Surrey, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Ordained PriestSacred Heart, Convent, Hammersmith, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Ordained BishopSt. Philip Neri, Church, Arundel, West Sussex, Diocese of Southwark, England
Death PlaceSt. Philip Neri, Church, Arundel, West Sussex, Diocese of Southwark, England
Buried Place (Original)St. John, Seminary, Wonersh, Guildford, Surrey, Diocese of Southwark, England

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 383, and Page 507
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 525
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 55
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,297
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 7
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast