Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilbert de Clérembault

Deceased

Bishop of Poitiers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1611¹BornPalluau
1 Sep 165746.6SelectedBishop of Poitiers, France
1 Apr 165847.2ConfirmedBishop of Poitiers, France
21 Jul 165847.5Ordained BishopBishop of Poitiers, France
3 Jan 168069.0DiedBishop of Poitiers, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gilbert de Clérembault:
Bishop Gilbert de Clérembault (died ) Bishop of Poitiers

  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 280
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015