Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis-Édouard-François-Désiré Cardinal Pie

Deceased

Bishop of Poitiers, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1815Born
25 May 183923.6Ordained PriestPriest of Chartres, France
29 May 184933.6SelectedBishop of Poitiers, France
28 Sep 184934.0ConfirmedBishop of Poitiers, France
25 Nov 184934.1Ordained BishopBishop of Poitiers, France
12 May 187963.6Elevated to Cardinal
22 Sep 187963.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria
18 May 188064.6DiedBishop of Poitiers, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Édouard-François-Désiré Pie (VIAF: 39395173)
Louis-Édouard-François-Désiré Cardinal Pie (born , died ) Bishop of Poitiers

EventPlace
Birth PlacePontgouin, Diocese of Chartres
Ordained PriestCathedral, Chartres, Diocese of Chartres
Ordained BishopCathedral, Chartres, Diocese of Chartres
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Poitiers, Diocese of Poitiers

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
  • a cardinal for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 454, and Page 51
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 May 1879
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017