Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of La Rochelle (-Saintes)

Dioecesis Rupellensis (-Santonensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Bernard Housset, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • United: 22 January 1852
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Poitiers
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 6,863 (2,650 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sud-Ouest
  • Official Web Site: http://catholique-larochelle.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: B.P. 1088, 26 rue Saint-Jean-du-Perot, 17087 La Rochelle CEDEX 02, France
  • Telephone: 5.46.41.40.06
  • Fax: 5.46.41.41.64

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of La Rochelle
4 May 1648ErectedDiocese of La Rochelle (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Luçon (suppressed) Diocese of La Rochelle
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Saintes (suppressed) Diocese of Angoulême
Diocese of La Rochelle
Diocese of Poitiers
6 October 1822Territory LostDiocese of La Rochelle Diocese of Luçon
Diocese of La Rochelle (-Saintes)
22 January 1852UnitedDiocese of La Rochelle Diocese of La Rochelle (-Saintes)
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of La Rochelle (-Saintes) (from Bordeaux)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of La Rochelle (-Saintes)
1950400,000500,00080.0%311343451,15911185498ap1951
1970440,000487,34390.3%259423011,46152438503ap1971
1980455,000502,80090.5%190582481,83473455477ap1981
1990475,000518,00091.7%161432042,328258361476ap1991
1999498,000539,00092.4%132361682,96484928960ap2000
2000380,000557,30568.2%124351592,389104728463ap2001
2001380,000557,30568.2%123331562,435114527558ap2002
2002380,000557,02468.2%111291402,714114024858ap2003
2003380,000557,02468.2%109301392,733133424855ap2004
2004380,000557,02468.2%121331542,467143722155ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 13 Sep 2014