Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Désiré Maigret, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Hawaiian Islands, USA

Titular Bishop of Arathia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1804Born
7 Jan 182217.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
23 Sep 182824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
25 Jul 183934.8AppointedPrefect of Sandwich Islands, Hawaii, USA
3 Aug 184439.8ResignedPrefect of Sandwich Islands, Hawaii, USA
11 Sep 184641.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sandwich Islands, Hawaii, USA
11 Sep 184641.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Arathia
31 Oct 184743.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arathia
11 Jun 188277.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Hawaiian Islands, USA

MicroData Summary for Louis-Désiré Maigret (VIAF: 188489204)
Bishop Louis-Désiré Maigret SS.CC. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Hawaiian Islands

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaillé, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 115
  • b: CB, 8 Mar 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast