Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Claude Cardinal de Longwy de Givry

Deceased

Administrator of Langres

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese in Agone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1481BornFranche-Conté
24 Apr 151029.3AppointedBishop of Mâcon, France
1528²47.0AppointedAdministrator of Langres, France
10 Nov 152948.9ResignedBishop of Mâcon, France
7 Nov 153352.8Elevated to Cardinal
10 Nov 153352.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese in Agone
29 Apr 153453.3AppointedAdministrator of Poitiers, France
27 Aug 154059.7AppointedAdministrator of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
24 Sep 154059.7AppointedAdministrator of Amiens, France
27 Aug 154160.7ResignedAdministrator of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
154665.0ResignedAdministrator of Amiens, France
30 Jan 155170.1ResignedAdministrator of Poitiers, France
9 Aug 156180.6DiedAdministrator of Langres, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude de Longwy de Givry:
Cardinal Claude de Longwy de Givry (died ) Administrator of Langres

  • a cardinal for 27.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Nov 1533
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 226

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013