Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Claude de La Poype de Vertrieu

Deceased

Bishop of Poitiers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1655Born
15 Apr 170247.1SelectedBishop of Poitiers, France
25 Sep 170247.6ConfirmedBishop of Poitiers, France
12 Nov 170247.7Ordained BishopBishop of Poitiers, France
3 Feb 173276.9DiedBishop of Poitiers, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Claude de La Poype de Vertrieu (VIAF: 7382274)
Bishop Jean-Claude de La Poype de Vertrieu (born , died ) Bishop of Poitiers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCornod

  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 314
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast