Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Edne-Henri-Philadelphe Bellot des Minières

Deceased

Bishop of Poitiers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1822BornPoitiers
19 Dec 184725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bordeaux, France
11 Dec 188058.1SelectedBishop of Poitiers, France
13 Dec 188058.1ConfirmedBishop of Poitiers, France
30 Jan 188158.2Ordained BishopBishop of Poitiers, France
15 Mar 188865.3DiedBishop of Poitiers, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Edne-Henri-Philadelphe Bellot des Minières:
Bishop Jacques-Edne-Henri-Philadelphe Bellot des Minières (born , died ) Bishop of Poitiers

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 454

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013