Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Joulain, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1852Born
22 May 187522.6Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
20 Jul 189340.8AppointedBishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
24 Aug 189340.9Ordained BishopBishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
8 Feb 191966.3DiedBishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Henri Joulain
Bishop Henri Joulain O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Jaffna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Romans-les-Melle, Diocese of Poitiers, France
Ordained BishopSt. Andre, Niort

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 327
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017