Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Girard de La Bornat (La Bournat)

Deceased

Bishop of Poitiers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1656Born
29 Mar 169841.8SelectedBishop of Poitiers, France
15 Sep 169842.2ConfirmedBishop of Poitiers, France
19 Oct 169842.3Ordained BishopBishop of Poitiers, France
8 Mar 170245.7DiedBishop of Poitiers, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine Girard de La Bornat (La Bournat)
Bishop Antoine Girard de La Bornat (La Bournat) (born , died ) Bishop of Poitiers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClermont Ferrand

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 314
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast