Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Abel-Louis Chappot de la Chanonie

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Clermont, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1898Born
19 Sep 192526.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 195354.4AppointedBishop of Clermont, France
26 May 195354.6Ordained BishopBishop of Clermont, France
18 Jan 197475.3RetiredBishop of Clermont, France
27 Aug 199091.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Clermont, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Abel-Louis Chappot de la Chanonie
Bishop Pierre-Abel-Louis Chappot de la Chanonie (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Clermont

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Florent des Bois

  • a priest for 64.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast