Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Louis Jolly, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi), China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1836Born
27 Aug 185720.7ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
2 Jun 186023.4Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
6 Aug 187538.6AppointedPrefect of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi), China
10 Nov 187740.9ResignedPrefect of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi), China
16 Mar 187841.2DiedPrefect Emeritus of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi), China

MicroData Summary for Louis Jolly
Father Louis Jolly M.E.P. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLenloître, Diocese of Poitiers, France
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 17.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 11 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast