Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Louis de La Marthonie de Caussade

Deceased

Bishop of Meaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1712BornPérigueux
20 Oct 174836.8SelectedBishop of Poitiers, France
21 Apr 174937.3ConfirmedBishop of Poitiers, France
18 May 174937.3Ordained BishopBishop of Poitiers, France
15 Feb 175947.1SelectedBishop of Meaux, France
12 Mar 175947.1ResignedBishop of Poitiers, France
9 Apr 175947.2ConfirmedBishop of Meaux, France
3 Feb 177967.0DiedBishop of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis de La Marthonie de Caussade:
Bishop Jean-Louis de La Marthonie de Caussade (died ) Bishop of Meaux

  • a bishop for 29.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015