Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude Jean Pierre Dagens

Bishop Emeritus of Angoulême


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1940 BornCaudéran
4 Oct 197030.3Ordained PriestPriest of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
3 Jul 198747.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poitiers, France
3 Jul 198747.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Vulturaria
20 Sep 198747.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vulturaria
15 Jun 199353.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Angoulême, France
22 Dec 199353.5SucceededBishop of Angoulême, France
9 Nov 201575.4RetiredBishop of Angoulême, France

MicroData Summary for Claude Jean Pierre Dagens
Bishop Claude Jean Pierre Dagens (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Angoulême

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Angoulême.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,160
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Feb 2016