Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Angoulême

Dioecesis Engolismensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Claude Jean Pierre Dagens, Bishop
  • Georges Rol, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 3rd Century
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Poitiers
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 5,972 (2,306 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sud-Ouest
  • Official Web Site: http://catholique-angouleme.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Maison Diocesaine, 226 rue de Bordeaux, 16021 Angouleme CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 5.45.91.34.44
  • Fax: 5.45.91.96.05

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Angoulême (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Périgueux (Vesuna) (suppressed) Diocese of Angoulême
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Saintes (suppressed) Diocese of Angoulême
Diocese of La Rochelle
Diocese of Poitiers
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Sarlat (suppressed) Diocese of Angoulême
6 October 1822Territory LostDiocese of Angoulême Diocese of Périgueux
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Angoulême (from Bordeaux)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1959300,000311,13796.4%260372971,01048507362ap1960
1970320,000331,01696.7%232342661,20340540363ap1971
1980234,000343,00068.2%171382091,119143364430ap1981
1990280,500340,77082.3%146261721,630429362374ap1991
1999270,000342,00078.9%109211302,076733272149ap2000
2000240,000339,62870.7%106171231,951729284148ap2001
2001240,000339,62870.7%98161142,105727258149ap2002
2002240,000339,62870.7%99151142,105726250149ap2003
2003240,000339,62870.7%96181142,105729249139ap2004
2004240,000339,62870.7%93171102,181728234125ap2005
2006231,000339,60068.0%86201062,179838210101ap2007
2012264,000352,11075.0%6620863,069113017288ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 21 Dec 2013