Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal Balue

Deceased

Bishop of Angers, France

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1421¹Born
4 Feb 146544.0SelectedBishop of Evreux, France
20 May 146544.3ConfirmedBishop of Evreux, France
4 Aug 146544.5Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
5 Jun 146746.4AppointedBishop of Angers, France
18 Sep 146746.7Elevated to Cardinal
11 Feb 146847.1InstalledBishop of Angers, France
13 May 146847.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
31 Jan 148362.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
13 Oct 148463.7AppointedBishop of Autun, France
Apr 1490³69.2ResignedBishop of Autun, France
14 Mar 149170.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
5 Oct 149170.7DiedBishop of Angers, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Balue (VIAF: 193877265)
Jean Cardinal Balue (born 1421, died ) Bishop of Angers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBasse d'Angles-sur-Langlin, Diocese of Poitiers
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceRipatransone

  • a bishop for 26.1 years
  • a cardinal for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1467
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 148, and Page 87
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 80
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1465, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Oct 2018

Quantcast