Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André-Hubert Juteau

Deceased

Bishop of Poitiers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1839Born
30 May 186324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Tours, France
5 Jun 188849.0SelectedBishop of Poitiers, France
14 Feb 188949.7ConfirmedBishop of Poitiers, France
23 Apr 188949.9Ordained BishopBishop of Poitiers, France
25 Nov 189354.5DiedBishop of Poitiers, France

MicroData Summary for André-Hubert Juteau (VIAF: 9674215)
Bishop André-Hubert Juteau (born , died ) Bishop of Poitiers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenais
Ordained BishopCathedral, Poitiers, Diocese of Poitiers

  • a priest for 30.4 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017