Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel-Marie-Ange de Briey

Deceased

Bishop of Meaux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1828Born
21 Aug 185324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Poitiers, France
12 Feb 188051.2SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Meaux, France
27 Feb 188051.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Meaux, France
27 Feb 188051.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhosus
9 May 188051.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhosus
30 Aug 188455.8SucceededBishop of Meaux, France
11 Dec 190981.0DiedBishop of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel-Marie-Ange de Briey (VIAF: 49357507)
Bishop Emmanuel-Marie-Ange de Briey (born , died ) Bishop of Meaux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMagné-en-Gençay
Ordained BishopCathedral, Poitiers, Diocese of Poitiers

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 377, and Page 482
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017