Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean du Bellay, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Poitiers


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Nov 1455AppointedBishop of Fréjus, France
21 Mar 1456Ordained BishopBishop of Fréjus, France
15 Apr 1462AppointedBishop of Poitiers, France
3 Sep 1479DiedBishop of Poitiers, France

MicroData Summary for Jean du Bellay:
Bishop Jean du Bellay O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Poitiers

  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 155, and Page 216
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,339

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013