Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philippe-Prosper Augouard, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Upper French Congo {Congo Francese Superiore} o Ubanghi, Congo

Titular Archbishop of Cassiope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1852Born
1874¹21.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
10 Jun 187623.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
14 Oct 189038.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Upper French Congo {Congo Francese Superiore} o Ubanghi, Congo
14 Oct 189038.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinitis
23 Nov 189038.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinitis
30 Nov 191563.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cassiope
3 Oct 192169.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Upper French Congo {Congo Francese Superiore} o Ubanghi, Congo

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philippe-Prosper Augouard (VIAF: 2650069)
Archbishop Philippe-Prosper Augouard C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Upper French Congo {Congo Francese Superiore} o Ubanghi

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoitiers, Diocese of Poitiers, France
Ordained Bishop30, rue Lhomond, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 519
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017