Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Arnaud Cardinal d’Aux

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1260¹BornLa Romieu
4 Nov 130646.8AppointedBishop of Poitiers, France
14 Nov 130646.9Ordained BishopBishop of Poitiers, France
23 Dec 131253.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
23 Dec 131253.0Elevated to Cardinal
14 Aug 1320³60.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Albano

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Arnaud d’Aux:
Cardinal Arnaud d’Aux (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

  • a bishop for 13.8 years
  • a cardinal for 7.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Dec 1312

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 8 Jan 2014