Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jérôme-Louis de Foudras de Courcenay

Deceased

Bishop of Poitiers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1685¹BornBourgogne
8 Jan 172136.0SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Poitiers, France
1 Dec 172136.9ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Poitiers, France
1 Dec 172136.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tlos
1 Feb 172237.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tlos
3 Feb 173247.0SucceededBishop of Poitiers, France
13 Aug 174863.6DiedBishop of Poitiers, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jérôme-Louis de Foudras de Courcenay:
Bishop Jérôme-Louis de Foudras de Courcenay (born 1685, died ) Bishop of Poitiers

  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 314, and Page 382
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015