Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Simon Cardinal de Cramaud

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

Administrator of Poitiers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1345¹BornCramaud
30 May 138237.4AppointedBishop of Agen, France
7 Aug 138338.6AppointedBishop of Béziers, France
24 Nov 138540.9AppointedBishop of Poitiers, France
27 May 139045.4AppointedArchbishop of Sens, France
17 Mar 139146.2AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
17 Mar 139146.2AppointedAdministrator of Avignon, France
19 Sep 139146.7ResignedAdministrator of Avignon, France
2 Jul 140964.5AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
13 Apr 141368.3Elevated to Cardinal
14 Apr 141368.3AppointedAdministrator of Poitiers, France
12 May 141368.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
15 Dec 142278.0DiedAdministrator of Poitiers, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Simon de Cramaud:
Cardinal Simon de Cramaud (died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

  • a cardinal for 9.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Apr 1413

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013