Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dominique-Georges-Frédéric Dufour de Pradt

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mechelen, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1759Born
Jun 1783³24.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 180445.6SelectedBishop of Poitiers, France
1 Feb 180545.7ConfirmedBishop of Poitiers, France
2 Feb 180545.7Ordained BishopBishop of Poitiers, France
12 May 180849.0SelectedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
27 Mar 180949.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
16 Sep 181556.3ResignedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
18 Mar 183777.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mechelen, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominique-Georges-Frédéric Dufour de Pradt
Archbishop Dominique-Georges-Frédéric Dufour de Pradt (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mechelen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAllanche, France

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 259, and Page 306
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1805, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast