Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph-Martin Urtasun

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1894Born
2 Jul 191722.8Ordained PriestPriest
10 Aug 195258.0AppointedBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France
28 Oct 195258.2Ordained BishopBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France
17 Sep 195561.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
17 Sep 195561.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Preslavus
22 Apr 195762.7SucceededArchbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
25 Jun 197075.8RetiredArchbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
25 Jun 197075.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Voncaria
10 Dec 197076.3ResignedTitular Archbishop of Voncaria
25 Feb 198085.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Martin Urtasun
Archbishop Joseph-Martin Urtasun (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBayonne

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast