Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Baptiste Urrutia, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Huê

Titular Archbishop of Carpathus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1901BornAldudes, France
6 Jun 192523.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
12 Feb 194846.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Huê, Viet Nam
12 Feb 194846.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Isauropolis
27 May 194846.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Isauropolis
24 Nov 196059.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Huê, Viet Nam
24 Nov 196059.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Carpathus
15 Jan 197977.1DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Huê, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Urrutia:
Archbishop Jean-Baptiste Urrutia M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Huê

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015