Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Jean Marie Marcel Molères

Bishop Emeritus of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1932 BornDax
14 Apr 196229.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jan 198653.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France
2 Mar 198653.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France
13 Jun 198653.6SucceededBishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France
15 Oct 200875.9RetiredBishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Jean Marie Marcel Molères:
Bishop Pierre Jean Marie Marcel Molères (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013