Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules-Basile Ferron de La Ferronnays

Deceased

Bishop of Lisieux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1736BornAngers
26 Dec 176933.5SelectedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
12 Mar 177033.7ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
8 Apr 177033.8Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
8 Dec 177438.4SelectedBishop of Bayonne, France
2 Mar 177538.7ResignedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
13 Mar 177538.7ConfirmedBishop of Bayonne, France
19 Oct 178347.3SelectedBishop of Lisieux, France
13 Dec 178347.4ResignedBishop of Bayonne, France
15 Dec 178347.5ConfirmedBishop of Lisieux, France
15 May 179962.9DiedBishop of Lisieux, France

MicroData Summary for Jules-Basile Ferron de La Ferronnays:
Bishop Jules-Basile Ferron de La Ferronnays (born , died ) Bishop of Lisieux

  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 113, and Page 131
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 261

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015