Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paul Joseph Marie Cardinal Gouyon

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

Cardinal-Priest of Natività di Nostro Signore Gesù Cristo a Via Gallia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1910BornBordeaux
13 Mar 193726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
6 Aug 195746.8AppointedBishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France
7 Oct 195747.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France
6 Sep 196352.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
6 Sep 196352.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pessinus
4 Sep 196453.9SucceededArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
28 Apr 196958.5Elevated to Cardinal
28 Apr 196958.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Natività di Nostro Signore Gesù Cristo a Via Gallia
15 Oct 198575.0RetiredArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
26 Sep 200089.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France

MicroData Summary for Paul Joseph Marie Gouyon:
Paul Joseph Marie Cardinal Gouyon (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.0 years
  • a cardinal for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 19 Feb 2014