Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bertrand Lacaste

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oran, Algeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1897Born
12 Mar 192325.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Dec 194548.5AppointedBishop of Oran, Algeria
25 Mar 194648.7Ordained BishopBishop of Oran, Algeria
30 Nov 197275.4RetiredBishop of Oran, Algeria
20 Apr 199496.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Oran, Algeria

MicroData Summary for Bertrand Lacaste
Bishop Bertrand Lacaste (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oran

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAccous, France

  • a priest for 71.1 years
  • a bishop for 48.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast