Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clément Joseph Mathieu

Deceased

Bishop of Aire et Dax


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1882BornHasparren
15 Jul 190624.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 193149.5AppointedBishop of Aire et Dax, France
28 Oct 193149.6Ordained BishopBishop of Aire et Dax, France
25 Mar 196381.0DiedBishop of Aire et Dax, France

MicroData Summary for Clément Joseph Mathieu:
Bishop Clément Joseph Mathieu (born , died ) Bishop of Aire et Dax

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013