Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marc Marie Max Aillet

Bishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1957 BornParakou, Benin
3 Jul 198225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Genova, Italy
15 Oct 200851.5AppointedBishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France
30 Nov 200851.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France

MicroData Summary for Marc Marie Max Aillet:
Bishop Marc Marie Max Aillet (born ) Bishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,990

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013