Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume d’Arché

Deceased

Bishop of Bayonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1702BornBordeaux
20 Apr 174542.7SelectedBishop of Bayonne, France
19 Jul 174542.9ConfirmedBishop of Bayonne, France
5 Sep 174543.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne, France
13 Oct 177472.1DiedBishop of Bayonne, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume d’Arché:
Bishop Guillaume d’Arché (born , died ) Bishop of Bayonne

  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 113

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015